NC H4 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Fairmont/Voluntary Annexation
Title
Fairmont/Voluntary Annexation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-02-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | Ref To Com On State and Local Government I |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S105 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-76