NC H399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-20)
Status: Passed on November 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-01 - Ch. SL 2019-237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extend Tax Credits/Other Finance Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Tax Credits/Other Finance Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-24 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 93 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-01 Ch. SL 2019-237
2019-11-01 Signed by Gov. 11/1/2019
2019-10-29 Pres. To Gov. 10/29/2019
2019-10-28 Ratified
2019-10-24HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-24SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-10-24SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-10-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-24HouseConf Report Adopted 3rd
2019-10-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/24/2019
2019-10-23SenateConf Com Reported
2019-10-23HouseConf Report Adopted 2nd
2019-10-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-23HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-23HousePlaced On Cal For 10/24/2019
2019-10-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-10-23HouseConf Com Reported
2019-10-22SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-10-22HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-10-22HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-10-22HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-22HouseReptd Unfav For Conc
2019-10-17HouseRef To Com On Finance
2019-10-17HouseRuled Material
2019-10-14HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-10-14SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-10-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-09SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-08SenateReptd Fav
2019-10-08SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-10-08SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-10-08SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-10-07SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Finance
2019-10-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-07SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-10-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-10SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-10SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-10SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-06-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-04HousePlaced On Cal For 06/05/2019
2019-06-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-04HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-05-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-29HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-03HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-21HouseRef to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-20HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H399
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H399v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/475
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/607
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/609
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/848
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/855
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/622
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/856

Bill Comments

feedback