NC H398 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-31 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pistol Purchase Permit Repeal
Title
Pistol Purchase Permit Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-30 | House | Received from the Governor |
2021-08-30 | Vetoed 08/30/2021 | |
2021-08-20 | Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2021 | |
2021-08-19 | Ratified | |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Counties
Criminal Records
Health Services
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Medical Records
Mental Health
Presented
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Records
Sheriffs
Title Change
Vetoed
Weapons
Criminal Records
Health Services
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Medical Records
Mental Health
Presented
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Records
Sheriffs
Title Change
Vetoed
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
122C | 54 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 315 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 402 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 405 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 407.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |