NC H397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Ch. SL 2017-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Ch. SL 2017-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Car. Shores Deannex/New Hanover Dwntwn. Devpt
Title
Car. Shores Deannex/New Hanover Dwntwn. Devpt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Ch. SL 2017-86 | |
2017-06-30 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | House | Fail Concur In S Amend SA1 |
2017-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2017 |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-03-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-20 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Filed |