NC H395 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Ch. SL 2021-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Ch. SL 2021-26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
HIE Deadline Extension & Patient Protection
Title
HIE Deadline Extension & Patient Protection
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] | Rep. Larry Potts [R] | Rep. Kristin Baker [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Sen. Gale Adcock [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Ch. SL 2021-26 | |
2021-05-27 | Signed by Gov. 5/27/2021 | |
2021-05-27 | Pres. To Gov. 5/27/2021 | |
2021-05-27 | Ratified | |
2021-05-26 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/26/2021 |
2021-05-25 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-05-24 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Chaptered
Council Of State
Data & Records Systems
Dhhs
Health
Health Information Exchange Authority
Health Information Exchange Board
Health Services
Hie Network
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Insurance
Laboratories
Medical Records
Occupations
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
State Treasurer
Teachers
Title Change
Chaptered
Council Of State
Data & Records Systems
Dhhs
Health
Health Information Exchange Authority
Health Information Exchange Board
Health Services
Hie Network
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Insurance
Laboratories
Medical Records
Occupations
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
State Treasurer
Teachers
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 414.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 414.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |