NC H394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Official State Cookie
Title
Official State Cookie
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Holly Grange [R] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Ashton Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed |