NC H389 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ch. SL 2019-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

ABC/Univ Athletic Facility

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABC/Univ Athletic Facility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 88 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Ch. SL 2019-52
2019-06-26 Signed by Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-21 Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2019
2019-06-20 Ratified
2019-06-19HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-19HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-17HousePlaced On Cal For 06/19/2019
2019-06-17HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-06-17HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-17SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-13SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2019
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-15HousePlaced On Cal For 04/16/2019
2019-04-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-02HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-20HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S296 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback