NC H368 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Ch. SL 2019-100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Ch. SL 2019-100
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Bermuda Run/Speed Restrictions
Title
Bermuda Run/Speed Restrictions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Ch. SL 2019-100 | |
2019-07-09 | Ratified | |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2019 |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/16/2019 |
2019-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-18 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S283 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate