NC H367 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act
Title
Uniform Partition of Heirs Property Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S363 (Same As) 2021-04-28 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
46A | 26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 87 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 88 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 89 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 91 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 92 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 93 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 94 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 95 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 96 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 97 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 98 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | 99 | (n/a) | Citation Text |