NC H362 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise Personal Leave Costs for Teachers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise Personal Leave Costs for Teachers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-10SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-10SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-05HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2021
2021-05-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-05HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-05HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-27HouseRe-ref Com On State Personnel
2021-04-27HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-24HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, State Personnel, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115C(n/a)Citation Text
115C302.1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback