NC H362 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

15-Point Scale For School Performance Grades

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

15-Point Scale For School Performance Grades

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-09HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-09SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-09SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-09SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-09SenateAmend Tabled A1
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-19SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-25HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-19HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-18HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H145 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback