NC H362 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Changes to the Juvenile Code.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes to the Juvenile Code.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21 Ch. SL 2017-161
2017-07-21 Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017
2017-06-29 Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
2017-06-29 Ratified
2017-06-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-29HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2017-06-28HousePlaced On Cal For 06/29/2017
2017-06-28HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-06-28HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2017-06-28SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-06-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-27SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-30SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-05-30SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-05-16SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-03-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-03-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-03-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-03-23HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2017
2017-03-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-03-23HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-22HouseRe-ref Com On Homelessness, Foster Care, and Dependency
2017-03-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-16HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Homelessness, Foster Care, and Dependency
2017-03-16HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-16HouseRef To Com On Judiciary IV
2017-03-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S570 (Same As) 2017-04-06 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H362&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H362v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H362v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H362v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H362v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H362v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H362v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H362v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=118
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=409
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=864

Bill Comments

feedback