NC H353 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-20 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-20 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Forsyth and Wake Bds. of Ed
Title
Winston-Salem/Forsyth and Wake Bds. of Ed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-08-19 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-08-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-08-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-17 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Charters
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Forsyth County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Title Change
Wake County
Winston-salem
Charters
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Forsyth County
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Term Lengths & Limits
Title Change
Wake County
Winston-salem