NC H351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Utilities/Rate Base/Fair Value Determination
Title
Utilities/Rate Base/Fair Value Determination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Watford Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - A1 Watford Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Ch. SL 2018-51 | |
2018-06-25 | House | Became Law W/o Signature |
2018-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Ratified | |
2018-06-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-14 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-06-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018 |
2018-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2018-06-13 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-20 | House | Serial Referral To State and Local Government II Stricken |
2017-03-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, State and Local Government II |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S339 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate