NC H35 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various County Public Notices
Title
Various County Public Notices
Sponsors
Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Rep. James Adams [R] | Sen. Bobby Hanig [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] |
Rep. Howard Penny [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government |
2021-02-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-02-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 4, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Burke County
Cabarrus County
Catawba County
Counties
Currituck County
Davidson County
Davie County
Electronic & Other Media
Electronic Government
Fees
Forsyth County
Haywood County
Information Technology
Internet
Iredell County
Jackson County
Local
Local Government
Media
Montgomery County
Notification
Publishing
Richmond County
Rockingham County
Rowan County
Rutherford County
Stanly County
Swain County
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Cabarrus County
Catawba County
Counties
Currituck County
Davidson County
Davie County
Electronic & Other Media
Electronic Government
Fees
Forsyth County
Haywood County
Information Technology
Internet
Iredell County
Jackson County
Local
Local Government
Media
Montgomery County
Notification
Publishing
Richmond County
Rockingham County
Rowan County
Rutherford County
Stanly County
Swain County
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 602.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 52.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 33 | (n/a) | Citation Text |