NC H344 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed On Cal For 06/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

System Development Fees Update

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

System Development Fees Update

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/21/2021
2021-06-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2021-06-15SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-09SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-09SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-06-09SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-08SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-06-08SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-27SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-29HouseSerial Referral To Local Government Stricken
2021-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-23HouseRef to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-23HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-22HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
162A(n/a)Citation Text
162A201(n/a)Citation Text
162A205(n/a)Citation Text
162A207(n/a)Citation Text
62133.12B(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H344
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H344v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H344v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H344v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H344v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50936/0/H344-PCS40455-SVf-11
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52048/0/H344-PCS40633-SVf-23
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H344-SMSV-14(CSSVf-11)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H344-SMTQ-60(e2)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H344-SMSV-63(e3)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/163

Bill Comments 750

feedback