NC H340 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Council on PANS & PANDAS
Title
Advisory Council on PANS & PANDAS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-03-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appointments
Councils
Dhhs
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health Services
Membership
Mental Health
Minors
Pans/pandas Advisory Council
Public
Councils
Dhhs
Diseases & Health Disorders
Health Services
Membership
Mental Health
Minors
Pans/pandas Advisory Council
Public
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 33.52 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 33.53 | (n/a) | Citation Text |