NC H338 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Coltrane Jazz & Blues Festival/Funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coltrane Jazz & Blues Festival/Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2019-05-06HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations, General Government Stricken
2019-03-13HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Appropriations, General Government, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-12HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback