NC H337 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unmanned Aircraft Systems Law Revisions
Title
Unmanned Aircraft Systems Law Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-160 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/05/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2017-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary II |
2017-03-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Filed |