NC H337 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Ch. SL 2010-28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Ch. SL 2010-28
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Statesville Deannexation
Title
Statesville Deannexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Ch. SL 2010-28 | |
2010-06-30 | Ratified | |
2010-06-29 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-31 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Placed On Cal For 3/30/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-11 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-03-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-02 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |