NC H337 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Ref To Com On Finance
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Ref To Com On Finance
Summary
Statesville Deannexation.
Title
Statesville Deannexation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-31 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Placed On Cal For 3/30/2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-11 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-03-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-02 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H337 |