NC H336 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt Osprey State Raptor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt Osprey State Raptor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-13SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-13SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-05-13HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-12HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-12HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-12HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-12HouseReptd Fav
2021-05-04HouseRe-ref Com On State Government
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-22HouseRef to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
145(n/a)Citation Text
14552(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback