NC H328 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Trade or Exchange of Spirituous Liquor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Trade or Exchange of Spirituous Liquor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-19SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-14HousePlaced On Cal For 04/15/2021
2021-04-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-31HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-31HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-23HouseRe-ref Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control
2021-03-23HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-18HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18B(n/a)Citation Text
18B103(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback