NC H320 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-20 - Ch. SL 2021-162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-20 - Ch. SL 2021-162
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modernize Remote Business Access
Title
Modernize Remote Business Access
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. John Bradford [R] | Rep. Erin Pare [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-15 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | Ch. SL 2021-162 | |
2021-09-20 | Signed by Gov. 9/20/2021 | |
2021-09-17 | Pres. To Gov. 9/17/2021 | |
2021-09-16 | Ratified | |
2021-09-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-15 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-09-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/15/2021 |
2021-09-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-09-09 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/25/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Corporations
For-profit
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Insurance
Nonprofit
Presented
Public
Ratified
Telecommunications
Telecommuting
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Commerce
Corporations
For-profit
Homeowners Associations
Housing
Insurance
Nonprofit
Presented
Public
Ratified
Telecommunications
Telecommuting
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
55 | 10-22 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55 | 6-01 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55 | 7-01 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55 | 7-02 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55 | 7-05 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55 | 7-09 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55 | 7-20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
55A | 1-40 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 1-41 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 1-70 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 2-07 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 3-03 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-01 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-02 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-03 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-04 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-05 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-06 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-08 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-09 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 7-24 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 8-20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
55A | 8-21 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
58 | 8-10 | (n/a) | Citation Text |