NC H32 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Equity in Opportunity Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equity in Opportunity Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-15SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-14HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-13HouseAmend Failed A1
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-13HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-13HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-01HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-01HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-03-23HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Education
2021-03-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-02-02HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-02-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-01-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H32
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H32v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H32v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H32v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H32v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1750/0/H32-PCS10174-MK-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/2311/0/H32-PCS40299-MKa-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50131/0/H32-ATC-49-V-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H32-SMTC-26(CSMK-1)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H32-SMTC-30(CSMK-1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H32-SMMK-1(CSMKa-2)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H32-SMTC-43(e3)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/95

Bill Comments

feedback