NC H32 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Year's Allowance
Title
Increase Year's Allowance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Ch. SL 2013-81 | |
2013-06-12 | Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013 | |
2013-06-06 | Pres. To Gov. 6/6/2013 | |
2013-06-05 | Ratified | |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/19/2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-03-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-04 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed |