NC H315 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Ch. SL 2022-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Ch. SL 2022-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Arson Law Revisions
Title
Arson Law Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Ch. SL 2022-8 | |
2022-06-14 | Signed by Gov. 6/14/2022 | |
2022-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2022 | |
2022-06-13 | Ratified | |
2022-06-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-09 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2022-06-09 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-08 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-07 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 3, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S454 (Same As) 2021-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Arson
Buildings
Chaptered
Council Of State
Crimes
Criminal Records
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Marshall
Firefighters & Firefighting
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Investigations
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Personnel
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Records
Sbi
Volunteers
Buildings
Chaptered
Council Of State
Crimes
Criminal Records
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Marshall
Firefighters & Firefighting
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Investigations
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Personnel
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Ratified
Records
Sbi
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
14 | 58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 59.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 61 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 62 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 62.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 62.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 62.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 64 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
14 | 69.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 943 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 233 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 234 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 292 | (n/a) | Citation Text |