NC H315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Instructional Material Selection
Title
Instructional Material Selection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-04 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/03/2019 |
2019-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |