NC H313 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Education - K-12 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Weighting/School Performance Grades

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Weighting/School Performance Grades

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H354 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
S319 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback