NC H31 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Material Fact Disclosure Clarifications
Title
Material Fact Disclosure Clarifications
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Hastings [R] | Rep. Scott Stone [R] | Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Mike Clampitt [R] | Rep. Andy Dulin [R] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] | Rep. Larry Potts [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - M8 Re-Refer Transportation Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - M8 Re-Refer Transportation Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2017-03-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/02/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-21 | House | Serial Referral To Transportation Stricken |
2017-02-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Transportation |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed |