NC H300 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-07-12 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Rockingham County/Public Notices
Title
Rockingham County/Public Notices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-07-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-05-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
1 | 602.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
153A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
153A | 52.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
159 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
159 | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
163 | 33 | (n/a) | Citation Text |