NC H3 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent Domain
Title
Eminent Domain
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-02-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/16/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S34 (Same As) 2017-02-08 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate