NC H299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Ch. SL 2019-66
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Henderson Cty/Build Community College Bldgs
Title
Henderson Cty/Build Community College Bldgs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Ch. SL 2019-66 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/15/2019 |
2019-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2019-03-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed |