NC H291 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial Prop. Plan Review
Title
Commercial Prop. Plan Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-04-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Building Codes
Buildings
Construction
Construction Industry
Council Of State
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Local Government
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public
Public Officials
Title Change
Buildings
Construction
Construction Industry
Council Of State
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Local Government
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public
Public Officials
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | 151.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | 151.13 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160D | 1104.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |