NC H290 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Abolish Columbus County Coroner
Title
Abolish Columbus County Coroner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2017-04-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-03-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-09 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S185 (Same As) 2017-05-22 - Ch. SL 2017-14