NC H290 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit Powdered Alcohol
Title
Prohibit Powdered Alcohol
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] | Rep. Larry Hall [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Yvonne Holley [D] |
Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Paul Luebke [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - A1 Daughtry Second Reading (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - A1 Daughtry Second Reading (Y: 83 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Health |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |