NC H289 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-17)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

DIT/Broadband Mapping -- Funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DIT/Broadband Mapping -- Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-05SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-05HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-01HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-01HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-01HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-31HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-31HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-23HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2021-03-23HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-15HouseRef to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
143B(n/a)See Bill Text
143B1321(n/a)See Bill Text
143B1370(n/a)See Bill Text
143B1373(n/a)See Bill Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback