NC H289 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

NC Money Transmitters Act.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Money Transmitters Act.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-30 Ch. SL 2016-81
2016-06-30 Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
2016-06-28 Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2016
2016-06-28 Ratified
2016-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2016-06-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2016-06-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2016-06-23SenateReptd Fav
2016-06-22SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2016-06-22SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-08-04SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-08-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-07-14SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-07-14SenateReptd Fav
2015-07-13SenateSequential Referral To Finance Added
2015-06-23SenateRe-ref Com On Commerce
2015-06-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2015-06-17SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2015
2015-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2015-06-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2015
2015-06-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2015-06-09SenateReptd Fav
2015-05-13SenateRe-ref Com On Commerce
2015-05-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2015-05-13SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2015-05-13SenatePassed 1st Reading
2015-05-13SenateRegular Message Received From House
2015-05-13HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2015-05-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-05-12HouseAdded to Calendar
2015-05-12HouseReconsidered 3rd Reading
2015-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2015-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2015-05-07HouseAdded to Calendar
2015-05-07HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2015-05-07HouseReptd Fav
2015-04-27HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2015-04-27HouseReptd Fav
2015-03-19HouseRef to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Finance
2015-03-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2015-03-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S680 (Same As) 2015-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Finance

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=H289&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H289v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H289v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H289v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H289v3.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=570
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=574
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=942
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=S&RCS=963

Bill Comments

feedback