NC H287 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Red Light Cameras/Hope Mills & Spring Lake
Title
Red Light Cameras/Hope Mills & Spring Lake
Sponsors
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. William Richardson [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Gregory Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-09 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed |