NC H286 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Dental Hygienists/Intraoral Local Anesthetics
Title
Dental Hygienists/Intraoral Local Anesthetics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/26/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed |