NC H284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Ch. SL 2018-22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

25-Year LEO Retirement Option

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

25-Year LEO Retirement Option

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22 Ch. SL 2018-22
2018-06-22 Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018
2018-06-14 Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
2018-06-14 Ratified
2018-06-14HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-14HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2018-06-13HousePlaced On Cal For 06/14/2018
2018-06-13HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2018-06-13HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-13SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-13SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-13SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-13SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-12SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-29SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2017-06-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2017-06-01HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2017-06-01HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-05-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-05-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-30HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2017-03-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-09HouseRef to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations
2017-03-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-08HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H284&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H284v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H284v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H284v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H284v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H284v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H284v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H284v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=782
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=638
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1153

Bill Comments

feedback