NC H282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Ch. SL 2021-27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Ch. SL 2021-27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Mount Airy/Even-Year Elections
Title
Mount Airy/Even-Year Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Jerry Carter [R] | Rep. Kyle Hall [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Ch. SL 2021-27 | |
2021-06-02 | Ratified | |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/01/2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/25/2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-04-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform |
2021-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-15 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Elections
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Mount Airy
Municipalities
Ratified
Session Laws
Surry County
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Elections
Local
Local Government
Mayors
Mount Airy
Municipalities
Ratified
Session Laws
Surry County