NC H276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modify Low-Performing School Definition
Title
Modify Low-Performing School Definition
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. John Fraley [R] | Rep. Ashton Clemmons [D] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] |
Rep. Raymond Smith [D] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |