NC H273 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-12)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Builders Inventory Tax Exclusion

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Builders Inventory Tax Exclusion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-12 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-23 Ch. SL 2021-113
2021-08-23 Signed by Gov. 8/23/2021
2021-08-17 Pres. To Gov. 8/17/2021
2021-08-16 Ratified
2021-08-12HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-12HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-08-12HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-08-12HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-08-11HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-08-11SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-08-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-09SenateReptd Fav
2021-07-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-07-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-07-14SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-07-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-01HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-15HouseRef to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105(n/a)Citation Text
105277.02(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H273
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H273v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H273v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H273v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H273v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H273v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H273v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50935/0/H273-PCS10378-SVf-14
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52520/0/H273-PCS30454-BAf-17
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H273-SMBG-9(e1)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H273-SMSV-23(CSSVf-14)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H273-SMBA-64(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H273-SMBA-65(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H273-SMBA-76(sl)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/160
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/374
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/467

Bill Comments

feedback