NC H272 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fox and Coyote Trapping
Title
Fox and Coyote Trapping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Ch. SL 2017-73 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-08 | House | Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |