NC H271 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Eminent Domain

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent Domain

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Third Reading (Y: 101 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-03-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-03-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-24HousePlaced On Cal For 03/25/2021
2021-03-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-03-24HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-23HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-23HouseReptd Fav
2021-03-15HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S378 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40A(n/a)Citation Text
40A3(n/a)Citation Text
CI-to(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback