NC H27 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Expiration of Vehicle Registration
Title
Clarify Expiration of Vehicle Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Ch. SL 2017-96 | |
2017-07-12 | Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017 | |
2017-06-26 | Ratified | |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-02-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/22/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-02-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-01 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |