NC H268 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend On-Site Wastewater Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend On-Site Wastewater Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-09HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-09SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-08SenateEngrossed
2019-07-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-08SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-29SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-29HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-25HousePlaced On Cal For 04/26/2019
2019-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-11HouseRe-ref Com On Health
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-06HouseRef to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-05HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H268
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H268v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H268v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H268v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H268v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H268v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H268v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H268v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/211
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/433
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/432
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/623

Bill Comments

feedback