NC H264 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-02 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Powers Accountability Act
Title
Emergency Powers Accountability Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-20 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-02 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-11-01 | House | Received from the Governor |
2021-11-01 | Vetoed 11/01/2021 | |
2021-10-22 | Pres. To Gov. 10/22/2021 | |
2021-10-21 | Ratified | |
2021-10-20 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-20 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-10-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/20/2021 |
2021-10-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-10-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-10-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-10-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-09-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-09-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-09-23 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-09-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/23/2021 |
2021-09-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-09-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/15/2021 |
2021-09-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-09-09 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-04-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/31/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Constitution
Council Of State
Councils
Counties
Deq
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Environment
Executive Orders
Governor
Health Depts.
Health Services
Local Government
Nc
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Public Officials
Ratified
State Employees
State Health Director
Vetoed
Council Of State
Councils
Counties
Deq
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Environment
Executive Orders
Governor
Health Depts.
Health Services
Local Government
Nc
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Public Officials
Ratified
State Employees
State Health Director
Vetoed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 145 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
166A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
166A | 19.20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
166A | 19.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
166A | 19.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text |