NC H259 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Election Integrity Act
Title
Election Integrity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-11-18 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/18/2021 |
2021-11-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-10-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-10-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-10-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/26/2021 |
2021-10-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-10-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-10-19 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-10-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/20/2021 |
2021-10-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-10-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-10-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/12/2021 |
2021-10-07 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-10-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/07/2021 |
2021-10-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-10-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-10-06 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-09-09 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-09-09 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Citizenship
Commerce
Contracts
Counties
Court Clerks
Courts
District Court
Elections
Elections Boards
Information Technology
Judges
Juries
Local Government
Manufacturing
Public
Public Officials
Purchasing
Records
State Board Of
Title Change
Voter Registration
Citizenship
Commerce
Contracts
Counties
Court Clerks
Courts
District Court
Elections
Elections Boards
Information Technology
Judges
Juries
Local Government
Manufacturing
Public
Public Officials
Purchasing
Records
State Board Of
Title Change
Voter Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
163 | 165.7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 182.12A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 82.14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
9 | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
9 | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
9 | 6.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
9 | 6.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |